TN SB2571 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Parental Accountability Act," requiring the juvenile court to assess a fine of $1,000 against a child who is found to be delinquent for a second or subsequent delinquent act, to be paid by the child’s parent, legal custodian, or guardian who had custody of the child at the time of the offense; permits the court to require the parent, legal custodian, or guardian to perform community service work in lieu of the mandatory fine if indigent. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4, relative to the Parental Accountability Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Taylor [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 72, Nays 24, PNV 2 |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1019) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0547) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1930 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.