TN SB2680 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, makes various revisions to the charter of Jamestown, including amending the qualifications of voters, the manner of holding elections, and the administrative organization of the city court. - Amends Chapter 54 of the Private Acts of 1959; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, makes various revisions to the charter of Jamestown, including amending the qualifications of voters, the manner of holding elections, and the administrative organization of the city court. - Amends Chapter 54 of the Private Acts of 1959; as amended.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 55 | |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2645 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pr. Ch. 55
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2680&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB2680.pdf |