TN SB2682 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires LEAs and public charter schools to advise an employee who is assaulted by a student of the employee's rights as a result of the assault; requires, instead of authorizes, the suspension of a student who commits an assault against an employee of the LEA or public charter school in which the student is enrolled from attendance at school and from attendance at all school-sponsored events for at least one calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39 and Title 49, relative to school employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2472 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.