TN SB2697 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 889
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 889
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that a person is eligible for drug court if the person has been charged with but not convicted of a violent felony or does not have a pattern of convictions for violent misdemeanors. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 22, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, provides that a person is eligible for drug court if the person has been charged with but not convicted of a violent felony or does not have a pattern of convictions for violent misdemeanors. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 22, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 889 | |
2012-04-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1199) | |
2012-04-18 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-16 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 2/21/12 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-07 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2890 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 889