TN SB2712 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes economic incentive programs for persons with disabilities to submit electronically their list of existing employment incentive programs promoting the hiring of disabled individuals to the commissioner of revenue for approval, on or before July 1 each year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 7; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21, relative to economic incentives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2846 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.