TN SB2750 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the Tennessee national guard, or a member of the national guard, from being released from state duty into federal active duty combat unless the United States congress has passed an official declaration of war or has taken an official action pursuant to Article 1, Section 8, Clause 15, of the United States Constitution to explicitly call forth the Tennessee national guard or a member of the national guard for the enumerated purposes to expressly execute the laws of the union, repel an invasion, or suppress an insurrection. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 1, relative to the military.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1609 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.