TN SB2756 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Reconciliation Sentencing Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to the Tennessee Reconciliation Sentencing Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2832 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee