TN SB2766 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises language prohibiting educators from discriminating against students on certain, specified bases to generally prohibiting educators from discriminating against students who are members of a protected class under federal or state law; removes the definition of "gender identity" for purposes of the family life curriculum. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to kindergarten through grade twelve education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 3 (Amendment 1 - HA0937) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2024-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0937) |
2024-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 5 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1634 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. SB subst.