TN SB2770 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the enhancement of criminal penalties up to life in prison without parole upon conviction of violent crimes by illegal aliens; conviction of possession of a firearm or deadly weapon by an illegal alien; or conviction of a violent crime on the property of a school by any person. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 33; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16; Title 33; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 49, relative to criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY PEARSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 22 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 2 BY PEARSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 22 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 70, Nays 22, PNV 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0758) |
2024-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0852) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to next calendar |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1872 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.