TN SB2816 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, repeals the professional privilege tax for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2627 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee