TN SB2844 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-28 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-28 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for issuance of military registration plates for honorably discharged veterans upon documented proof at initial application only, rather than each year, to correspond with current practice for retired veterans obtaining such plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, provides for issuance of military registration plates for honorably discharged veterans upon documented proof at initial application only, rather than each year, to correspond with current practice for retired veterans obtaining such plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2824 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-16 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Public Safety of TR of Transportation Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2844&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2844.pdf |