TN SB2844 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that an eligible petitioner may file a petition for expunction under certain circumstances if the offense the person is seeking to expunge occurred prior to any conviction for an offense that is not eligible for expunction; allows an eligible petitioner who has been convicted of more than two offenses to seek expunction of two eligible offenses under certain circumstances; makes various other clarifications relating to expunction laws. - Amends TCA Section 40-32-101.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 40-32-101, relative to expunction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-23 | House | Passed H. Ayes 89, Nays 6, PNV 0 |
2024-04-23 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0992) |
2024-04-23 | House | Am. reconsidered. (Amendment 2 - HA0992) |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2024-04-23 | House | Motion to lift from table adopted. |
2024-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate returned to House for further action. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Re-refer to S. Cal Comm |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0992) |
2024-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0756) |
2024-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0919) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2686 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.