TN SB2868 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a process for the majority and minority party caucuses of the general assembly to nominate candidates for United States senator; provides that such process becomes operable for each respective senatorial seat when the respective incumbent declines to run for re-election, loses a re-election bid, or a vacancy is created in the office. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 13, relative to selection of candidates for United States senator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2401 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee