TN SB2878 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds first degree murder, second degree murder, and voluntary manslaughter to the offenses for which a defendant, who has been convicted of a violation that resulted in the death of a parent of a minor child, must pay restitution in the form of child maintenance to each of the victim's children until each child reaches 18 and has graduated from high school. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, relative to victims of certain criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2960 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee