TN SB2898 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, replaces the statutory terms "board member" and "member" with the term "trustee" in the provisions governing appointments to the board of trustees in the event of vacancies resulting from the death, disability, resignation, or ineligibility of a state employee who serves on the board. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
As introduced, replaces the statutory terms "board member" and "member" with the term "trustee" in the provisions governing appointments to the board of trustees in the event of vacancies resulting from the death, disability, resignation, or ineligibility of a state employee who serves on the board. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2669 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration