TN SB2974 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, moves election date for the county special school district board of trustees to coincide with the general election. - Amends Chapter 62 of the Private Acts of 1981; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 62 of the Private Acts of 1981; as amended by Chapter 181 of the Private Acts of 1981; Chapter 107 of the Private Acts of 1987; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Gibson County Special School District Board of Trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2989 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2974&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SB2974.pdf |