TN SB2983 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, rewrites the city charter. - Amends Chapter 103 of the Acts of 1903; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 103 of the Acts of 1903; as amended by Chapter 506 of the Acts of 1903; Chapter 502 of the Acts of 1907; Chapter 203 of the Acts of 1907; Chapter 314 of the Acts of 1909; Chapter 84 of the Private Acts of 1915; Chapter 543 of the Private Acts of 1917; Chapter 640 of the Private Acts of 1917; Chapter 616 of the Private Acts of 1921; Chapter 23 of the Private Acts of 1925; Chapter 598 of the Private Acts of 1925; Chapter 446 of the Private Acts of 1927; Chapter 792 of the Private Acts of 1927; Chapter 718 of the Private Acts of 1929; Chapter 581 of the Private Acts of 1929; Chapter 296 of the Private Acts of 1931; Chapter 158 of the Private Acts of 1931; Chapter 527 of the Private Acts of 1941; Chapter 266 of the Private Acts of 1945; Chapter 206 of the Private Acts of 1947; Chapter 689 of the Private Acts of 1947; Chapter 298 of the Private Acts of 1949; Chapter 297 of the Private Acts of 1949; Chapter 473 of the Private Acts of 1951; Chapter 565 of the Private Acts of 1953; Chapter 73 of the Private Acts of 1953; Chapter 74 of the Private Acts of 1953; Chapter 72 of the Private Acts of 1953; Chapter 247 of the Private Acts of 1959; Chapter 41 of the Private Acts of 1961; Chapter 112 of the Private Acts of 1963; Chapter 283 of the Private Acts of 1965; Chapter 487 of the Private Acts of 1967; Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 1971; Chapter 207 of the Private Acts of 1972; Chapter 7 of the Private Acts of 1977; Chapter 256 of the Private Acts of 1978; Chapter 269 of the Private Acts of 1978; Chapter 214 of the Private Acts of 1984; Chapter 138 of the Private Acts of 2000; Chapter 7 of the Private Acts of 2001; Chapter 4 of the Private Acts of 2001; Chapter 78 of the Private Acts of 2004; Chapter 45 of the Private Acts of 2010; Chapter 44 of the Private Acts of 2012; Chapter 52 of the Private Acts of 2012; Chapter 441 of the Private Acts of 1931 and Chapter 196 of the Private Acts of 1980; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter for the City of Morristown.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/22/2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2999 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Signed by H. Speaker
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2983&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SB2983.pdf |