TN SJR0011 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Certified Government Financial Manager Month," March 2023
Title
A RESOLUTION to designate March 2023 as "Certified Government Financial Manager Month" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-03-30 | House | Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2023-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | Reset on Consent cal. for 3/30/23 |
2023-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2023-03-02 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/21/2023 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |