TN SJR0148 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Assigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Assigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirms the legislature's intent to provide access to contraceptives.
Title
A RESOLUTION to reaffirm the legislature's intent to provide access to contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee |
2023-04-06 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |