TN SJR0351 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Affirms the General Assembly's attempt to protect pregnant people, their friends, and their families.
Title
A RESOLUTION to reaffirm the General Assembly's intent to protect pregnant people and their friends and family.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |