TN SJR0643 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Reverend Martha Kathryne Bowen Wagley
Title
Reverend Martha Kathryne Bowen Wagley
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-17 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-06-17 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-17 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-17 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-06-16 | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2009-06-16 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 6/16/09 | |
2009-06-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-06-12 | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-06-08 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-06-08 | Filed for intro. |