TN SJR0687 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Raymond and Jane Knowles, 50th wedding anniversary
Title
Raymond and Jane Knowles, 50th wedding anniversary
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-02-03 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-02-02 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-02-02 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-02-02 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-02-01 | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 1 | |
2010-01-29 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/01/10 | |
2010-01-28 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-01-28 | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-01-26 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 01/28/2010 | |
2010-01-25 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-11 | Filed for intro. |