TN SJR0918 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges creation of state certified peer recovery program for veterans.
Title
A RESOLUTION relative to reducing the veteran suicide rate through a peer recovery program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-01 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-12 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/8/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |