TN SJR1091 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
National Physical Therapy Month
Title
A RESOLUTION to celebrate National Physical Therapy Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-28 | House | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-26 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to lift from the table adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |