TN SJR1164 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Robert Jonathan Doyle Springer
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor Robert Jonathan Doyle Springer upon his exemplary service to the Tennessee General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-21 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-03-18 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |