TN SR0176 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Pearl-Cohn High School, TSSAA Class 4A state football champions
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate the Pearl-Cohn High School Firebirds, TSSAA Class 4A state football champions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |