TX HB101 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the formula funding for public institutions of higher education for certain credit hours that do not count toward a degree.
Title
Relating to the formula funding for public institutions of higher education for certain credit hours that do not count toward a degree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-22 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-05 | Record vote | |
2009-05-05 | Passed | |
2009-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-22 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Tuition
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum