TX HB1065 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of a rural resident physician grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of a rural resident physician grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#313 (Y: 132 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-14HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-14HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed
2019-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-10SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-15SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-12HouseRecord vote RV#322
2019-04-12HousePassed
2019-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#313
2019-04-11HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-11HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1084 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Higher Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback