TX HB1082 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Referred to Administration
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Referred to Administration
Summary
Relating to the North Texas Municipal Water District.
Title
Relating to the North Texas Municipal Water District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Referred to Administration | |
2009-05-12 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-04-15 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-01 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-31 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-18 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-03-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time | |
2009-02-05 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-02-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB715 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BONDS
NORTH TEXAS MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
NORTH TEXAS MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility