TX HB1090 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Referred to Natural Resources
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Referred to Natural Resources
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Oak Point Water Control and Improvement District No. 4 of Denton County; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Oak Point Water Control and Improvement District No. 4 of Denton County; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-18 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time | |
2009-02-06 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-02-05 | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
OAK POINT WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 4 OF DENT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
OAK POINT WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 4 OF DENT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.