TX HB1146 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to workplace violence prevention in certain health care facilities.
Title
Relating to workplace violence prevention in certain health care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Labor
Labor--Health & Safety
MEDICAL CARE FACILITIES
Safety
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Labor
Labor--Health & Safety
MEDICAL CARE FACILITIES
Safety