TX HB12 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to gifts and other consideration made to state agencies for state employee salary supplement or other purposes and to publication by state agencies of staff compensation and related information.
Title
Relating to gifts and other consideration made to state agencies for state employee salary supplement or other purposes and to publication by state agencies of staff compensation and related information.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] |
Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. William Zedler [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-26 - House - HB 12Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2013-05-27 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2013-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-26 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2013-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-23 | House | House requests conference committee |
2013-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Government Organization |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-10 | House | Passed as amended |
2013-05-10 | House | Amended |
2013-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to Transparency in State Agency Operations, Select |
2013-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
GIFTS & DONATIONS
INTERNET
Open Records
Salaries & Expenses
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
GIFTS & DONATIONS
INTERNET
Open Records
Salaries & Expenses
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control