TX HB1227 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Administration
Pending: Senate Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Administration
Pending: Senate Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authority of the Hunt Memorial Hospital District to appoint, contract for, or employ physicians.
Title
Relating to authority of the Hunt Memorial Hospital District to appoint, contract for, or employ physicians.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#320 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-13 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1236 (Same As) 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
HUNT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL DISTRICT
PHYSICIANS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
PHYSICIANS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital