TX HB1243 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the penalty for the offense of illegal voting; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the penalty for the offense of illegal voting; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2231 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#685 (Y: 88 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#649 (Y: 83 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#648 (Y: 59 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#647 (Y: 62 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2231 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#685 (Y: 88 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#649 (Y: 83 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#648 (Y: 59 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#647 (Y: 62 N: 84 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2023-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#2231 |
2023-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2023-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2023-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2023-05-26 | House | House requests conference committee |
2023-05-26 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#685 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#649 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#648 |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-Manuel |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#647 |
2023-04-27 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Bucy |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Elections |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB52 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Elections
HB52 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Elections
SB166 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Co-author authorized
HB1735 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Elections
HB52 (Same As) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Elections
SB166 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Co-author authorized
HB1735 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Elections