TX HB125 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the online publication of home addresses of certain occupational license holders.
Title
Relating to the online publication of home addresses of certain occupational license holders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#74 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#74 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-21 | House | Record vote RV#74 |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-03-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHEMICAL DEPENDENCY COUNSELORS
DYSLEXIA
EXAMINERS OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Open Records
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
Protection of Personal Information
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
SOCIAL WORKER EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
DYSLEXIA
EXAMINERS OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Open Records
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
Protection of Personal Information
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
SOCIAL WORKER EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF