TX HB1380 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the jurisdiction of certain courts and fees collected by a justice court; increasing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the jurisdiction of certain courts and fees collected by a justice court; increasing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1199 (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#1156 (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-09SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1199
2019-05-09HousePassed
2019-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#1156
2019-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-08HouseAmendment adopted as amended 1-Geren
2019-05-08HouseAmendment amended 2-Shine
2019-05-08HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-08HouseAmended 1-Geren
2019-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback