TX HB1398 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the motor vehicle sales tax applicable to motor vehicles used by transportation companies for certain purposes.
Title
Relating to the motor vehicle sales tax applicable to motor vehicles used by transportation companies for certain purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
SCHOOL BUSES & SCHOOL BUS DRIVERS
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--State
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
SCHOOL BUSES & SCHOOL BUS DRIVERS
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Taxation--State
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General