TX HB1409 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the granting of undergraduate course credit by examination or assessment at public institutions of higher education; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the granting of undergraduate course credit by examination or assessment at public institutions of higher education; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET