TX HB1457 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Summary
Relating to procedures concerning verification of certain information submitted in a voter registration application.
Title
Relating to procedures concerning verification of certain information submitted in a voter registration application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-02 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-01 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Elections | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-19 | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SECRETARY OF STATE
Elections--Administration
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SECRETARY OF STATE