TX HB1473 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disclosure of certain relationships with local government officers and vendors.
Title
Relating to disclosure of certain relationships with local government officers and vendors.
Sponsors
Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] | Rep. Alex Dominguez [D] | Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D] |
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--General
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local