TX HB1501 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Texas Behavioral Health Executive Council and to the continuation and transfer of the regulation of psychologists, marriage and family therapists, professional counselors, and social workers to the Texas Behavioral Health Executive Council; providing civil and administrative penalties; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Texas Behavioral Health Executive Council and to the continuation and transfer of the regulation of psychologists, marriage and family therapists, professional counselors, and social workers to the Texas Behavioral Health Executive Council; providing civil and administrative penalties; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1690 (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#234 (Y: 134 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#225 (Y: 42 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#234 (Y: 134 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#225 (Y: 42 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1690 |
2019-05-22 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Perry |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#234 |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#225 |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-Coleman and S. Davis |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended 1-Darby |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB611 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
ATTORNEY GENERAL
BEHAVIORAL HEALTH EXECUTIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
EXAMINERS OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Governor
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HEALTH PROFESSIONS COUNCIL
Health--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MARRIAGE & FAMILY THERAPISTS, TEXAS ST. BD. OF EXAMINERS OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATES
PSYCHOLOGISTS
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
PSYCHOLOGY INTERJURISDICTIONAL COMPACT COMMISSION
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
SOCIAL WORKER EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
ATTORNEY GENERAL
BEHAVIORAL HEALTH EXECUTIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
EXAMINERS OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Governor
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HEALTH PROFESSIONS COUNCIL
Health--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MARRIAGE & FAMILY THERAPISTS, TEXAS ST. BD. OF EXAMINERS OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATES
PSYCHOLOGISTS
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
PSYCHOLOGY INTERJURISDICTIONAL COMPACT COMMISSION
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
SOCIAL WORKER EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills