TX HB1541 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles and to the operations of certain other entities performing functions associated with the department.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles and to the operations of certain other entities performing functions associated with the department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB604 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
AUTOMOBILE BURGLARY & THEFT PREVENTION AUTHORITY
MOTOR VEHICLE CRIME PREVENTION AUTHORITY
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
MOTOR VEHICLE CRIME PREVENTION AUTHORITY
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1541 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01541I.htm |