TX HB1557 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a municipality to pledge certain tax revenue for the payment of obligations related to hotel projects.
Title
Relating to the authority of a municipality to pledge certain tax revenue for the payment of obligations related to hotel projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONVENTIONS & CONVENTION CENTERS
HOTELS & MOTELS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CONVENTIONS & CONVENTION CENTERS
HOTELS & MOTELS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1557 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01557I.htm |