TX HB16 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a requirement that a state agency post its internal auditor's audit plan and audit report and other audit information on the agency's Internet website.
Title
Relating to a requirement that a state agency post its internal auditor's audit plan and audit report and other audit information on the agency's Internet website.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Rep. Lyle Larson [R] |
Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. William Zedler [R] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - HB 16Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Open Government |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-10 | House | Passed as amended |
2013-05-10 | House | Amended |
2013-05-10 | House | Amended |
2013-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to Transparency in State Agency Operations, Select |
2013-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |