TX HB1611 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from the assessment requirements of the Texas Success Initiative for students who successfully complete certain college preparatory courses.
Title
Relating to the exemption from the assessment requirements of the Texas Success Initiative for students who successfully complete certain college preparatory courses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS