TX HB1625 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of false report of criminal conduct committed by emergency responder.
Title
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of false report of criminal conduct committed by emergency responder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#639 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#639 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-23 | House | Amended 1-J. González |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement