TX HB1677 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to notice by a governmental entity regarding certain geospatial data products.
Title
Relating to notice by a governmental entity regarding certain geospatial data products.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-27 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-27 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-03 | Read first time | |
2009-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1320 (Similar To) 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
County Government
County Government--General
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
City Government--General
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
County Government
County Government--General
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions