TX HB1711 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to requiring the Texas Department of Criminal Justice to establish a comprehensive reentry and reintegration plan for offenders released or discharged from a correctional facility.
Title
Relating to requiring the Texas Department of Criminal Justice to establish a comprehensive reentry and reintegration plan for offenders released or discharged from a correctional facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Marisa Marquez [D] | Rep. Armando Martinez [D] | Rep. Sylvester Turner [D] |
Rep. Marc Veasey [D] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-28 | House discharges conferees-reported | |
2009-05-28 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Record vote | |
2009-05-28 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | House discharges conferees | |
2009-05-23 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-23 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-23 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-23 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-23 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-23 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Passed | |
2009-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-05-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-26 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-03-03 | Read first time | |
2009-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1786 (Same As) 2009-03-20 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF