TX HB1763 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Reported favorably as substituted
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Reported favorably as substituted
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of money from certain attorney accounts delivered to the comptroller as unclaimed property.
Title
Relating to the disposition of money from certain attorney accounts delivered to the comptroller as unclaimed property.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed |