TX HB1771 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-26 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-26 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to rules regarding the provision by a health professional of a telemedicine medical service, teledentistry dental service, or telehealth service.
Title
Relating to rules regarding the provision by a health professional of a telemedicine medical service, teledentistry dental service, or telehealth service.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] |
Rep. Jacey Jetton [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#199 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#199 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2023-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2023-05-26 | House | House requests conference committee |
2023-05-26 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-14 | House | Record vote RV#199 |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed |
2023-04-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DENTAL SERVICES
Electronic Information Systems
Health Care Providers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
TELEMEDICINE
Electronic Information Systems
Health Care Providers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
RECORDS MANAGEMENT
TELEMEDICINE